HI SB2626 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - (H) Recommitted to FIN with Representative(s) Har, Manahan, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Bertram, Hanohano excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - (H) Recommitted to FIN with Representative(s) Har, Manahan, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Bertram, Hanohano excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary freeze on the hiring of individuals to perform work that has traditionally been done by State civil service employees. Requires every state agency to report to the legislature regarding all non-civil service, temporary employees for each quarterly period. Extends the initial probation period of certain civil service positions to 12 months. Effective July 1, 2020. (SB2626 HD1)
Title
Public Service; Positions Insulated from Partiality; Non-Civil Service, Temporary Employees; Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | (H) Recommitted to FIN with Representative(s) Har, Manahan, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Bertram, Hanohano excused. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1209-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 7:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-29-10 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, M. Lee, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Saiki; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Souki, Pine; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-12-10 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 230) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Bunda, Hee, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2616) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hee, Hooser, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-25-10 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-10 10:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |