HI SB2614 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies penalties for violations of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations rules from a fixed fine to a fine proportional to the yearly income of the violator.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2547 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2614&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2614_.HTM |