HI SB2609 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information on the financial disclosure statements deemed to be public records for non-paid volunteer members of state boards and commissions under section 85-7(d)(8), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to be redacted. (SB2609 HD1)
Title
Relating To Financial Disclosure Statements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 4:15 pm in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 1:50PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Dela Cruz, Gabbard. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Keohokalole. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Evans, Har, Kobayashi, San Buenaventura, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1923-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, LoPresti voting no (2) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 236) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Harimoto . Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Kim, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2546) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2192 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).