HI SB2603 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders under accident and health or sickness insurance and group hospital and medical services contracts and health maintenance organizations.
Title
Insurance; Autism Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2603 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2603_.HTM |