HI SB2574 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:35PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:35PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes clarifying housekeeping amendments to the registration requirements regarding the medical use of marijuana. Adds certifying physician requirements for written certification of medical marijuana use. (SB2574 HD2)
Title
Medical Marijuana; Registration; Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:35PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:50AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Creagan, Nakashima, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-10-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 430). |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Cullen, Har, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-03-14. |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Ito, Oshiro, Yamane. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Ito. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |