HI SB2573 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an employer with twenty or more employees to make reasonable efforts to provide a clean location for breastfeeding employees to express breast milk in privacy. Requires covered employers to post a notice pertaining to this provision in a conspicuous location. Establishes a civil fine for the failure of an employer to provide a location or post notice. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Breastfeeding; Employment Practices; Labor and Industrial Relations
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2228 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.