HI HB2228 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an employer with twenty or more employees to make reasonable efforts to provide a clean location for breastfeeding employees to express breast milk in privacy. Requires covered employers to post a notice pertaining to this provision in a conspicuous location. Establishes a civil fine of $50 for the failure of an employer to provide a location or post a notice. Provides an exemption for covered employers if compliance imposes an undue hardship. Effective January 7, 2059. (SD1)
Title
Breastfeeding; Labor and Industrial Relations; Wage and Hour Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2987) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-19-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-21-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Re-referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 21 | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ERB. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okamura. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-31-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to LAB, ERB, JUD, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2573 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.