HI SB2566 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources to provide assistance and supplemental funding to the National Wildlife Research Center of the U.S. Department of Agriculture to conduct pilot field studies to evaluate control tools and develop a management plan to reduce the rose-ringed parakeet population on Kauai.
Title
Relating To The Rose-ringed Parakeet.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2081 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 180, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2566&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2566_.HTM |