HI HB2081 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 180, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to provide assistance and supplemental funding to the National Wildlife Research Center of the U.S. Department of Agriculture to conduct pilot field studies to evaluate control tools, develop a control plan, and support other efforts to reduce the rose-ringed parakeet population on Kauai. (HB2081 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Rose-ringed Parakeet.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11HouseAct 180, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
2018-07-11SenateAct 180, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9-18).
2018-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday, 05-01-18.
2018-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakamura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:25AM in conference room 224.
2018-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 10:25AM in conference room 224.
2018-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
2018-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Riviere Co-Chairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 658) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3622) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-22SenateReported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2018-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2018-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 2:55PM in conference room 224.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
2018-03-02SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 69).
2018-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-14HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-07HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-18 8:45AM in House conference room 312.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 7
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2566 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback