HI SB2560 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Resources Development to establish the department's hiring and promotion goals for position-qualified transgender and non-binary persons and develop the State's Transgender Employment Policy addressing specified areas by 1/1/2024. Requires annual reports to the Legislature before the Regular Sessions of 2025 and 2026. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Equal Employment Opportunity.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from LCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA/GVO, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1677 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Department of Human Resources Development
Employment
Hiring and Promotion Goals
Inclusive Employment Policies
Non-Binary Persons
Report
State Transgender Employment Policy
Employment
Hiring and Promotion Goals
Inclusive Employment Policies
Non-Binary Persons
Report
State Transgender Employment Policy