HI SB2558 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts any new construction of or expansion of existing fossil-fueled, electricity-generating facilities unless the electric utility company can demonstrate compliance with the renewable energy portfolio standards; exempts any retrofit or replacement for the purposes of improved efficiency or to lower greenhouse gas emissions; authorizes the governor to exempt facilities if an emergency is declared. (SD1)
Title
Fossil-Fueled, Electricity-Generating Facility; Restriction
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2233) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |