HI SB2525 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the east Kapolei community development district under the Hawaii Community Development Authority and amends the HCDA membership accordingly. Requires HCDA to establish a plan by 1/1/2020 to return jurisdiction over the Kakaako district to the City and County of Honolulu, to occur on 7/1/2024. (SB2525 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Cullen, Lowen, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 210) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Nishihara. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ETT/HOU/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
East Kapolei Community Development District
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Transit-Oriented Development
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Transit-Oriented Development