HI SB2518 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates funds for the Hawaii State Energy Office to conduct a statewide environmental assessment for, and subsequently administer, a geothermal resources characterization program under the direction of the Hawaii Groundwater and Geothermal Resources Center at the University of Hawaii. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Geothermal Energy Exploration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 10:34AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 774). |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Garrett, Kila, Ward. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Poepoe; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 139) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2569 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Geothermal Energy
Geothermal Resources Characterization Program
Hawaii State Energy Office
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Geothermal Energy
Geothermal Resources Characterization Program
Hawaii State Energy Office