HI SB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Liquor Commission to deny any renewal for a liquor license if the applicant for renewal has violated any provision of the Intoxicating Liquor Law under chapter 281, Hawaii Revised Statutes, on three separate occasions during the twelve-month period preceding the renewal application date.
Title
Relating To The Liquor Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=25&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB25_.HTM |