HI SB2496 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires original equipment manufacturers of digital electronic equipment to make documentation, parts, and tools available to independent repair providers and owners for the purposes of diagnosis, maintenance, and repair on fair and reasonable terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Model State Right-to-repair Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1884 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback