HI HB1884 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires original equipment manufacturers of digital electronic equipment to make documentation, parts, and tools available to independent repair providers and owners for the purposes of diagnosis, maintenance, and repair on fair and reasonable terms. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Model State Right-to-repair Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Matsumoto.
2020-01-27HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2496 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback