HI SB2475 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue and expand health care apprenticeship programs at UH community colleges.
Title
Relating To Apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-18 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1638 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2475&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2475_.HTM |