HI HB1638 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue and expand health care apprenticeship programs at UH community colleges. Takes effect on 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HRE/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 136). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-18 2:00PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2018-01-24 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-01-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 01-24-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to HHS, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |