HI SB2468 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the national standard of a minimum of twenty-four months in an accredited podiatric residency prior to licensure as a podiatrist, beginning on 01/01/2015. Specifies additional requirements for out-of-state podiatrists who graduated from an approved college before 01/01/2004, who are seeking initial licensure in Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Podiatrists; Podiatry; Minimum Residency Requirements; Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2499) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1882 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - Act 063, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).