HI HB1882 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 063, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 063, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the national standard of a minimum of twenty-four months in an accredited podiatric residency prior to licensure as a podiatrist, beginning on 01/01/2015. Specifies separate requirements for out-of-state podiatrists who graduated from an approved college before 01/01/2004, who are seeking initial licensure in Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Podiatrists; Podiatry; Minimum Residency Requirements; Licensure
Sponsors
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Act 063, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163). |
2014-05-01 | House | Act 063, on 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163). |
2014-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 688). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2014-04-14 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 678). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Slom Members. |
2014-04-11 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-24-14. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 391). |
2014-03-24 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Hee, Ige, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-21-14. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2923) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, C. Lee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Oshiro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |