HI SB2458 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the judiciary to contract with nonprofit organizations to provide legal counsel and assistance to lowincome noncitizens. Defines "low-income" to mean a person whose family income is no more than the federal poverty level. Effective 12/31/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Legal Services For Low-income Immigrants.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Tokioka. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 231) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3039) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2511) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1759 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).