HI SB2456 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans import, use, manufacture, sale, and storage of chlorpyrifos in the State.
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1756 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Re-referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2456&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2456_.HTM |