HI SB2454 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 189, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 189, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows courts to establish by court rules fees to certify copies of pleadings, orders, transcripts, and other documents, whether upon or subsequent to initial filing or issuance. Provides an exemption for state agencies, which exemption may by court rule be limited. (CD1)
Title
Courts; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 189, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 681). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 189, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 443). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 81-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 81-10). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tsutsui, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-20-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 622). | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Senator(s) Takamine added as conferee(s). | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 575). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-15-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Souki, Thielen. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 363). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Keith-Agaran, Wooley. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 12:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Manahan, Souki, Takumi excused (4). | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) B. Oshiro, Thielen. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-09-10 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2445) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 02-08-10 10:00am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |