HI SB2452 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to the distribution of government publications to require deposit of electronic or digital copies, unless printed copies are requested.
Title
Relating To Government Publications.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TEC/GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2452&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2452_.HTM |