HI SB2448 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any public facility or entity that receives state or county funding and discovers a beehive or swarm on its property to contract with a beekeeper or pest control operator for removal and destroy the beehive only as a last resort. Effective 12/31/33. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Bees.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |