HI SB2438 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the Hawaii election campaign fund with the general revenues of the State as the funding source for the operating expenses of the campaign spending commission. Appropriates moneys to the commission for operating expenses. (SD2)
Title
Campaign Finance; Campaign Spending Commission; Operating Expenses; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-15-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2156 (Same As) 2016-07-13 - Act 247, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).