HI HB2156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 247, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 247, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the permitted uses of campaign funds to include paying for expenses incurred for membership in civic or community groups. (HB2156 CD1)
Title
Campaign Finance; Permissible Uses of Campaign Funds ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 247, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 247, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Oshiro voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Nishimoto, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:20 PM in Conference Room 325. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Kim. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kawakami, McDermott. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2016-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 488) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3367) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-22-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 261). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2438 (Same As) 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).