HI SB2432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the factors the director of commerce and consumer affairs must consider when determining whether cable service should be made available upon a new application of a cable franchise. Requires that the director require cable operators to provide cable service to residences in their service area where there is a minimum density of at least twenty-five homes per linear mile, with certain exceptions. Authorizes the director to grant waivers. Effective 1/2/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Cable Television.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 241) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2920) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TEC, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2595 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).