HI SB2431 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates funds for the department of health to conduct comprehensive workforce and cost analysis reviews with federal partners to improve efficiency, quality, and cost-effectiveness. Appropriates funds for collective bargaining increases and other current expenses.
Title
Relating To Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2741) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2236 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.