HI HB2236 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for collective bargaining increases and other current expenses. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Medical Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-17-20 2:16PM in conference room 211.
2020-03-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-03-13SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 323).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2431 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback