HI SB2424 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Agriculture a program specialist position. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2424&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2424_.HTM |