HI SB2424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of the practice of medicine to provide uniformity of practice for both medical physicians and osteopathic physicians. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Practice Of Medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1209-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Mizuno. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 06-24-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Nishimoto. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 236) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2941) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |