HI SB2392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to establish an electronic registry system for the purpose of collecting a patient's provider order for life-sustaining treatment form and disseminating the information to an authorized user. Specifies certain requirements for the registry.
Title
Relating To Provider Orders For Life-sustaining Treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-08-18 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2392&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2392_.HTM |