HI SB239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 156, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 156, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Moves the framework for establishing an annual conference of secondary school students into Chapter 302A, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Amends the framework of the annual conference and student conference committee. Clarifies the role of the student conference advisory committee. (CD1)
Title
Education; Secondary School Students Conference
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 156, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 156, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37). |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ing, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takumi, Ing Co-Chairs; Takai, Fale. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 511). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1538) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 100) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |