HI SB2385 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 42, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, and removes sunset date.
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2016 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2385&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2385_.HTM |