HI SB2384 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any vehicle involved in a motor vehicle accident that cannot be moved under its own power or is otherwise disabled to be towed away at the expense of the registered owner. Specifies the applicable requirements and fees for towing motor vehicles involved in accidents under certain circumstances. Exempts certain automobile clubs or towing companies from motor vehicle towing and storage requirements. Effective 9/1/2020. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 397). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1268-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from TRN/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Onishi. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/CPC on Friday, 03-13-20 11:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 223) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2976) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |