HI SB237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB237
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the standard of care for the State's veteran homes, long term care facilities and nursing homes in response to the COVID-19 pandemic by describing requirements for care facility licensing and leadership, implementing standards of recordkeeping, creating protocols for emergencies and personal protective equipment, and establishes a hotline for complaints. Sunsets 6/30/2026.
Title
Relating To Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB237 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=237&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB237_.HTM |