HI SB2362 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii tourism authority to work in cooperation with the department of transportation to develop and air on incoming commercial flights to the State public service announcements about the State's fragile ecosystem and how to protect it; appropriates funds for the public service announcements from the tourism special fund. (SD1)
Title
Conservation Outreach; Hawaiian Monk Seals; Airline Public Service Announcements; Appropriation; Tourism Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from WTL/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to WTL/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |