HI SB2343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources, as administrative host of the Hawaii Invasive Species Council, for invasive species prevention, control, outreach, research, and planning. (SB2343 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Invasive Species Council; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Solomon, Ige Co-Chairs; Ihara, Slom Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1629-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (5). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Awana. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 03-17-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2552) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2276) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1716 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - Act 102, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).