HI SB2335 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements voting provisions for uniformed services and overseas absentee voters, as required by the Military and Overseas Voter Empowerment Act, 42 U.S.C. Sections 1973ff through 1973ff-6. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB2335 HD1)
Title
Elections; Uniformed Services and Overseas Absentee Voters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takai, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-09-10 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to EBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2526) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 9:35am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |