HI SB2312 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain caregivers to execute an affidavit for caregiver consent on behalf of a minor to allow the minor to participate fully in programs and services under the Individuals with Disabilities Act and section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973.
Title
Education; Full Participation in School Act; Kupuna Caucus
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HMS, EDU. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2197 (Same As) 2012-01-23 - (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2312 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2312_.HTM |