HI SB2285 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the deposit into trust of one hundred per cent of all funds paid to purchase a pre-need funeral plan plus all interest earned. Allows a cemetery or pre-need authority to deduct certain allowable expenses from a trust. Requires annual statements of the disposition of trust funds.
Title
Pre-need Funeral Trusts
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on CPN has rescheduled its decision making 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-23-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2146 (Same As) 2010-01-22 - (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2285&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2285_.HTM |