HI SB2252 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of compensation for retirement benefits.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2252&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2252_.HTM |