HI SB2244 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the benefit multiplier for judges who become judges, are reappointed, or promoted after June 30, 2016. (SB2244 HD1)
Title
Retirement; Pension; Judges; Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6). |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 123) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Deferred until 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2123 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.