HI SB2202 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends immunity from liability to a person who voluntarily permits the use of the person's property to shelter people during a natural or man-made disaster. (SD1)
Title
Civil Defense; Immunity from Liability; Private Shelters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-02-10 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-10 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |