HI SB2180 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services' program requirements for chore services to include an assessment of whether the applicant has a family member who is available and capable of providing necessary chore services for the applicant. Requires the Department of Human Services to improve access for disabled persons seeking chore services by taking certain actions and submitting a report to the Legislature. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Chore Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |