HI SB2177 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) Referred to PBS/LAB, referral sheet 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) Referred to PBS/LAB, referral sheet 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that county police chiefs be appointed and removed as prescribed by each county's charter. (SD1)
Title
Counties; Chief of Police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (H) Referred to PBS/LAB, referral sheet 23 | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9). | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Hee, Ihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-04-10. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-10 1:15pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |