HI SB217 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the statute of limitations for civil actions brought by persons subjected to sexual offenses as a minor against the natural person who committed the act or acts constituting the sexual offense. Authorizes suits against a legal entity in certain circumstances. Revives for a two-year period certain actions for which the statute of limitations had previously lapsed. Authorizes a court to award attorney's fees to a defendant under certain circumstances. Requires a certificate of merit for all plaintiffs. (CD1)
Title
Limitation of Actions; Sexual Offenses Against Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1350). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1350). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tueaday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 30) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 30). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Jordan, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Hee, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Jordan, Wooley, Pine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Luke. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-11 3:30PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Wooley, Yamane. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 106) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |