HI SB2142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyists Law to eliminate outdated references to criminal violations and requires an individual to demonstrate good cause for noncompliance. Clarifies that the State Ethics Commission may require payment of an administrative fine or restitution pursuant to a settlement agreement. (SB2142 HD1)
Title
Relating To Lobbyists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2018-02-13 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 8) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-18. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1738 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4