HI SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the court to appoint counsel to indigent parents and make every effort to do so at the first hearing attended by the parent. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Child Protective Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-04SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB905 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback